IA SF2042 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2157. S.J. 191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2157. S.J. 191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of off-road utility vehicles on state park road systems.(See SF 2157.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of off-road utility vehicles on state park road systems.(See SF 2157.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2157. S.J. 191. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 9:30AM Room 315. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Knox. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 105. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2118 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 285.
SF2157 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 625.
SF2157 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 625.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2042 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2042.html |