IA SF2041 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2388. S.J. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2388. S.J. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to severance payments provided for in school administrator employment contracts and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2388.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to severance payments provided for in school administrator employment contracts and including applicability provisions.(See SF 2388.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2388. S.J. 337. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 4:00PM Room G15. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Garrett, and Giddens. S.J. 120. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 93. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2388 (Similar To) 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2041 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2041.html |