IA SF2037 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Jacoby and Wills. H.J. 372.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Jacoby and Wills. H.J. 372.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the minimum standard of transparency for motor vehicle window tint, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the minimum standard of transparency for motor vehicle window tint, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Jacoby and Wills. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 333. |
2018-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 327. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 384. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 35, nays 13. S.J. 380. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 311. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bertrand, Brown, and Danielson. S.J. 109. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 104. |