IA SF2031 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing police service dogs to receive emergency veterinary medical services while on duty.(See SF 2296.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing police service dogs to receive emergency veterinary medical services while on duty.(See SF 2296.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 260. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 3:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Boulton, and Shipley. S.J. 99. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2296 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 260.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2031 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2031.html |