IA SF2003 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision of information relating to school immunization exemptions.(See SF 2196.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision of information relating to school immunization exemptions.(See SF 2196.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 203. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Donahue, and Salmon. S.J. 119. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 42. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2045 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 91.
SF2196 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Message from House, with amendment S-5166. S.J. 841.
SF2196 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Message from House, with amendment S-5166. S.J. 841.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2003 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2003.html |