IA SF2 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a state family planning services program, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a state family planning services program, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HousePassed subcommittee.
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee: Koester, Lundgren and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 248.
2017-02-06HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 194.
2017-02-06HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 191.
2017-02-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 205.
2017-02-02SenatePassed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20. S.J. 205.
2017-02-02SenateAmendment S-3010 filed, adopted. S.J. 205.
2017-02-01SenateFiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
2017-01-31SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 188.
2017-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 75.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 44.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback