IA SF198 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to elderly persons with aggressive or psychiatric behaviors in long-term care facilities. (Formerly SF 35.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to elderly persons with aggressive or psychiatric behaviors in long-term care facilities. (Formerly SF 35.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-14 | House | Subcommittee, Fry, Hunter, and Lofgren. H.J. 564. |
2013-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 548. |
2013-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 528. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 503. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 500. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 278. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 275. |