IA SF184 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act repealing the state interagency Missouri river authority.(Formerly SSB 1020.)
Title
A bill for an act repealing the state interagency Missouri river authority.(Formerly SSB 1020.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 831. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:00PM RM 15. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Gjerde and Jacobsen. H.J. 384. |
2021-02-09 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 325. |
2021-02-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 294. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 240. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 238. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 198. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 195. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1020 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 184.