IA SF179 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 584. S.J. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 584. S.J. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the offense of sexual activity with an individual sixteen or seventeen years of age, and providing penalties. (See SF 584.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the offense of sexual activity with an individual sixteen or seventeen years of age, and providing penalties. (See SF 584.)
Sponsors
Sen. Roby Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 584. S.J. 547. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 272. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 227. |
Same As/Similar To
SF584 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 109.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF179 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF179.html |