IA SF172 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of sex act or sexual activity for purposes of the Iowa criminal code. (Formerly SSB 1013.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of sex act or sexual activity for purposes of the Iowa criminal code. (Formerly SSB 1013.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 854. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 853. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 319. |
2021-02-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 383. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 350. |
2021-02-10 | House | Substituted for HF 281. H.J. 349. |
2021-02-04 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 298. |
2021-02-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 293. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 237. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 235. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 176. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 166. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1013 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 172.
HSB15 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 281.
HF281 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
HSB15 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 281.
HF281 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.