IA SSB1013 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF172
Note: Legislation replaced by HF281

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 172.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the definition of sex act or sexual activity for purposes of the Iowa criminal code.(See SF 172.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the definition of sex act or sexual activity for purposes of the Iowa criminal code.(See SF 172.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 172.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:30AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Sinclair.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB15 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 281.
SF172 (Replaced by) 2021-02-11 - Message from House. S.J. 319.
HF281 (Replaced by) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback