IA SF17 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Boettger, and Sodders. S.J. 447.
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Boettger, and Sodders. S.J. 447.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the compulsory school attendance age and providing effective dates.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the compulsory school attendance age and providing effective dates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Boettger, and Sodders. S.J. 447. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-01-15 | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Dvorsky, and McKinley. S.J. 98. | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 82. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0024B&ga=83 |