IA SF159 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to educational offerings and funding by establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, modifying and establishing charter school programs, modifying provisions governing the state's open enrollment law including voluntary diversity plans, modifying the tuition and textbook tax credit, providing for the educator expense deduction, modifying provisions related to education data collection and permissible education programs and funding, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1065.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to educational offerings and funding by establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, modifying and establishing charter school programs, modifying provisions governing the state's open enrollment law including voluntary diversity plans, modifying the tuition and textbook tax credit, providing for the educator expense deduction, modifying provisions related to education data collection and permissible education programs and funding, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1065.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3012 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3011 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3009 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3008 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseFiscal note.
2021-02-01HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 264.
2021-02-01HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 260.
2021-01-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 193.
2021-01-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 26, nays 21. S.J. 192.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3010 filed, lost. S.J. 192.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3007 filed, lost. S.J. 191.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3012 filed, lost. S.J. 191.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3009 filed, lost. S.J. 190.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3008 filed, lost. S.J. 189.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3011 filed, lost. S.J. 189.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3006 filed, adopted. S.J. 189.
2021-01-28SenateFiscal note.
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 175.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Appropriations. S.J. 164.
2021-01-26SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 163.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 11:30AM Senate Chamber.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Bolkcom, et al. S.J. 161.
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 155.
2021-01-25SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 154.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 151.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1065 (Related) 2021-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 159. S.J. 154.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF159
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF159.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/SF159.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1210618.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1210993.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210128_SJNL.pdf#192
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210128_SJNL.pdf#190
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210128_SJNL.pdf#189
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210128_SJNL.pdf#191
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210127_SJNL.pdf#176
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210126_SJNL.pdf#163

Bill Comments

feedback