IA SSB1065 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF159

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 159. S.J. 154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to educational offerings and funding by establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, modifying and establishing charter school programs, modifying provisions governing the state's open enrollment law including voluntary diversity plans, modifying the tuition and textbook tax credit, providing for the educator expense deduction, modifying provisions related to education data collection and permissible education programs and funding, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 159.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to educational offerings and funding by establishing a student first scholarship program for certain pupils attending nonpublic schools, establishing a student first scholarship fund, providing an income tax exemption, modifying and establishing charter school programs, modifying provisions governing the state's open enrollment law including voluntary diversity plans, modifying the tuition and textbook tax credit, providing for the educator expense deduction, modifying provisions related to education data collection and permissible education programs and funding, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 159.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 159. S.J. 154.
2021-01-25SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 10:30AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Quirmbach, and Zaun.
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Education.
2021-01-20SenateBy COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

SF159 (Replaced by) 2021-02-11 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback