IA SF12 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 251. S.J. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 251. S.J. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a limitation on the amount of administrative costs for school districts.(See SF 251.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a limitation on the amount of administrative costs for school districts.(See SF 251.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 251. S.J. 301. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 102. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 45. |
Same As/Similar To
SF251 (Similar To) 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF12 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF12.html |