IA SF115 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Greene. S.J. 145.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to grounds for discipline of physicians and surgeons, osteopathic physicians and surgeons, and physician assistants, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to grounds for discipline of physicians and surgeons, osteopathic physicians and surgeons, and physician assistants, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Greene. S.J. 145.
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 119.

Same As/Similar To

HF112 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 644.
HF577 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 769.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback