IA HF577 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions based on their treatment of Lyme disease or other tick-borne diseases, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 112.) Effective 3-23-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions based on their treatment of Lyme disease or other tick-borne diseases, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 112.) Effective 3-23-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 769.
2017-03-23HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 766.
2017-03-23HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 766.
2017-03-21HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 705.
2017-03-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 692.
2017-03-27SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 787.
2017-03-21SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 690.
2017-03-21SenatePoint of order raised on S-3156, ruled out of order. S.J. 689.
2017-03-21SenateSubstituted for SF 480. S.J. 689.
2017-03-15SenateAmendment S-3156 filed. S.J. 646.
2017-03-14SenateRead first time and attached to companion SF 480. S.J. 594.
2017-03-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 594.
2017-03-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 644.
2017-03-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 755.
2017-03-14HousePassed House, ayes 93, nays 0. H.J. 642.
2017-03-09HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 567.

Same As/Similar To

SF115 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Greene. S.J. 145.
HF112 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 644.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback