IA SF103 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education.
Title
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Sweeney, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 141. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 126. |
Same As/Similar To
HF167 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 716.
HF795 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 604.
HF795 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 604.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF103 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF103.html |