IA HF795 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 604.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 604.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education.(Formerly HF 167.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education.(Formerly HF 167.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 604. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 598. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 598. |
2021-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 716. |
2021-03-16 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 737. |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 1. H.J. 713. |
2021-03-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 616. |
Same As/Similar To
SF103 (Similar To) 2021-01-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
HF167 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 716.
HF167 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 716.