IA HSB96 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF271
Note: Legislation replaced by SF420
Note: Legislation replaced by SF420
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 271.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 271.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to investments of funds by life insurers, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 271.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to investments of funds by life insurers, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 271.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 271. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 2:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Young, Graber and Judge. H.J. 188. |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 186. |
2023-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1084 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 420.
HF271 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
SF420 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 885.
HF271 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
SF420 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 885.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB96 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB96.html |