IA HSB88 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF496
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill for establishing certain privileges for military victim advocates.
Title
A study bill for establishing certain privileges for military victim advocates.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-02-04 | House | 10:30AM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-01-27 | House | Judiciary: Rizer Chair,Anderson, and Nunn. |
2015-01-27 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1030 (Related) 2015-01-14 - Judiciary: Sodders Chair,Quirmbach, and Schneider.
HF496 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.
HF496 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.