IA HSB726 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2655
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2655.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2655.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act placing assessment limitations for property tax purposes on commercial child care facilities, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2655.)
Title
A bill for an act placing assessment limitations for property tax purposes on commercial child care facilities, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2655.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2655. |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 540. |
2024-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/29/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Bloomingdale and Judge. H.J. 383. |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 381. |
2024-02-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3181 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Brown, and Petersen.
HF2655 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Brown, and Petersen. S.J. 631.
HF2655 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Brown, and Petersen. S.J. 631.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB726 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB726.html |