IA HSB701 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2573
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of telemedicine in the issuance of a certification to receive a medical cannabidiol registration card.(See HF 2573.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of telemedicine in the issuance of a certification to receive a medical cannabidiol registration card.(See HF 2573.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2573. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 283. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Holt and Srinivas. H.J. 257. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 254. |
2024-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2573 (Replaced by) 2024-03-05 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Shipley, and Weiner. S.J. 453.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB701 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB701.html |