IA HSB690 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of psychiatrists in the mental health professional loan repayment program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of psychiatrists in the mental health professional loan repayment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 12:15PM RM 304. |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Matson and Moore, T. H.J. 234. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 232. |
2024-02-08 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB690 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB690.html |