IA HSB649 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2389
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the term sex and related terms for purposes of statutory construction, including an indication of a person's sex on certain vital records and on certain applications and identification cards.(See HF 2389.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the term sex and related terms for purposes of statutory construction, including an indication of a person's sex on certain vital records and on certain applications and identification cards.(See HF 2389.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2389. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 217. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Hora, Boden and Steckman. H.J. 185. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 183. |
2024-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF2389 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 224.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB649 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB649.html |