IA HSB647 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2545
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the medical privacy and freedom Act, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2545.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the medical privacy and freedom Act, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2545.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2545. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 293. |
2022-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 2:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Boden and Hunter. H.J. 162. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 159. |
2022-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2545 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 437.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB647 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB647.html |