IA HSB639 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2265
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2373
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2373
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restrictions regarding companies boycotting Israel.(See HF 2373.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to restrictions regarding companies boycotting Israel.(See HF 2373.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 246. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Boden and Wolfe. H.J. 161. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 158. |
2022-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3089 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2265.
SF2265 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn. S.J. 411.
HF2373 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 654.
SF2265 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn. S.J. 411.
HF2373 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 654.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB639 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB639.html |