IA HF2373 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 654.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 654.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restrictions regarding companies boycotting Israel. (Formerly HSB 639.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to restrictions regarding companies boycotting Israel. (Formerly HSB 639.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 654. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 654. |
2022-06-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 434. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 412. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 40, nays 5. S.J. 411. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2265. S.J. 410. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2265. S.J. 390. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 390. |
2022-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 61, nays 35. H.J. 380. |
2022-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 239. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3089 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2265.
HSB639 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373.
SF2265 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn. S.J. 411.
HSB639 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373.
SF2265 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn. S.J. 411.