IA HSB620 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2285
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2663
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2663
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to national training for personnel of county commissions of veteran affairs, and making appropriations.(See HF 2285, HF 2663.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to national training for personnel of county commissions of veteran affairs, and making appropriations.(See HF 2285, HF 2663.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2285. |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 176. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Ingels, Rinker and Turek. H.J. 154. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 151. |
2024-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2285 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 656.
HF2663 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
HF2663 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB620 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB620.html |