IA HSB604 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to patriotic exercises and civic and historical instruction regarding certain holidays in public schools.
Title
A bill for an act relating to patriotic exercises and civic and historical instruction regarding certain holidays in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:30PM RM 19 (Cancelled). |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Hora, Boden and Staed. H.J. 133. |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 129. |
2024-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB604 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB604.html |