IA HSB600 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2337
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2501
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2501
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil actions involving asbestos and silica, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil actions involving asbestos and silica, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Kaufmann and Derry. H.J. 165. |
2020-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3167 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2337.
SF2337 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
HF2501 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
SF2337 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
HF2501 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB600 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB600.html |