IA HSB592 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2448
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of sports betting by gambling licensees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of sports betting by gambling licensees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 12:00PM House Lounge |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Highfill, Baltimore and Cohoon. H.J. 172. |
2018-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2448 (Replaced by) 2018-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB592 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB592.html |