IA HSB587 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying the social studies curriculum provided to students enrolled in grades one through twelve in school districts, charter schools, and innovation zone schools, and modifying the responsibilities of school districts, charter schools, and innovation zone schools related to requiring teachers and students to sing the national anthem.
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including by modifying the social studies curriculum provided to students enrolled in grades one through twelve in school districts, charter schools, and innovation zone schools, and modifying the responsibilities of school districts, charter schools, and innovation zone schools related to requiring teachers and students to sing the national anthem.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Stone, Cahill and Thompson, P. H.J. 111. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 108. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB587 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB587.html |