IA HSB577 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of the department of administrative services' report on state employee salaries.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of the department of administrative services' report on state employee salaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Golding, Baeth and Dunwell. H.J. 110. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 107. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3059 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB577 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB577.html |