IA HSB575 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the composition of a county zoning commission.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the composition of a county zoning commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Cohoon and Moore, T. H.J. 97. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 94. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB575 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB575.html |