IA HSB571 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2192
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2295
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2295
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning state agency response to a proclamation of disaster emergency.(See HF 2295.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning state agency response to a proclamation of disaster emergency.(See HF 2295.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2295. |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 185. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 12:15PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bossman and Gjerde. H.J. 97. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 93. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3029 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 769.
HF2295 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 769.
HF2295 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB571 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB571.html |