IA SSB3029 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2192
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2295
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2295
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning state agency response to a proclamation of disaster emergency.(See SF 2192.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning state agency response to a proclamation of disaster emergency.(See SF 2192.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 10:30AM Room G17. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Guth. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB571 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2295.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 769.
HF2295 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 769.
HF2295 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3029 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3029.html |