IA HSB569 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to relating to the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission contract approval process.
Title
A bill for an act to relating to the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission contract approval process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bacon and Nielsen. H.J. 97. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 93. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3031 (Related) 2022-01-18 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Bisignano, and Williams.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB569 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB569.html |