IA HSB566 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2508
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 321.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 321.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to garnishment proceedings and service of a garnishee.
Title
A bill for an act relating to garnishment proceedings and service of a garnishee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 321. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Hagenow and Derry. H.J. 163. |
2020-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2508 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 333.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB566 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB566.html |