IA HSB544 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2175
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2172
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2172
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the maximum value of life insurance companies’ and life insurance associations’ investments in CM3 classified mezzanine loans as a percentage of such company’s or association’s legal reserve.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the maximum value of life insurance companies’ and life insurance associations’ investments in CM3 classified mezzanine loans as a percentage of such company’s or association’s legal reserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2018 2:30PM House Lounge |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Pettengill, Landon and Forbes. H.J. 120. |
2018-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2175 (Replaced by) 2018-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 514.
SF2172 (Replaced by) 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 437.
SSB3056 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2172 (Replaced by) 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 437.
SSB3056 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB544 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB544.html |