IA HF2175 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the maximum value of life insurance companies’ and life insurance associations’ investments in CM3 classified mezzanine loans as a percentage of such company’s or association’s legal reserve. (Formerly HSB 544.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the maximum value of life insurance companies’ and life insurance associations’ investments in CM3 classified mezzanine loans as a percentage of such company’s or association’s legal reserve. (Formerly HSB 544.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 514. |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 488. |
2018-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 393. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 436. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 436. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2172. S.J. 435. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2172. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 314. |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 178. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB544 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3056 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2172 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 437.
SSB3056 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2172 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 437.