IA HSB542 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2170
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2338
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2338
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for modifying the notice period for public improvement projects.
Title
A study bill for modifying the notice period for public improvement projects.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2016-02-09 | House | 9:45AM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-28 | House | 11:00AM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-26 | House | State Government: Pettengill Chair,Bacon, and Stutsman. |
2016-01-26 | House | In State Government |
2016-01-26 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3040 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Voted - State Government.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 589.
HF2338 (Replaced by) 2016-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 397.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 589.
HF2338 (Replaced by) 2016-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 397.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB542 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB542.html |