IA HSB511 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2023
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil liability of sports officials, providing criminal penalties for assault of sports officials, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil liability of sports officials, providing criminal penalties for assault of sports officials, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Mitchell and Donahue. H.J. 111. |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 95. |
2020-01-16 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2023 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:30PM RM G17.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB511 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB511.html |