IA SF2023 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:30PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:30PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil liability of sports officials, providing criminal penalties for assault of sports officials, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil liability of sports officials, providing criminal penalties for assault of sports officials, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Schultz, and R. Taylor. S.J. 89. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 80. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB511 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2023 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2023.html |