IA HSB3 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF302
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a graduated eligibility phase-out program for state child care assistance.(See HF 302.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a graduated eligibility phase-out program for state child care assistance.(See HF 302.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 302. |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 225. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 1:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bradley and Ehlert. H.J. 70. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 67. |
2021-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF302 (Replaced by) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB3 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB3.html |