IA HF302 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a graduated eligibility phase-out program for state child care assistance. (Formerly HSB 3.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a graduated eligibility phase-out program for state child care assistance. (Formerly HSB 3.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1117. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1068. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 1066. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 732. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Johnson, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 391. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 320. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 320. |
2021-02-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 382. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 347. |
2021-02-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 243. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB3 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 302.