IA HSB255 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF579
Note: Legislation replaced by HF732

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 732.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting and requiring certain actions relating to abortion involving the detection of a fetal heartbeat, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 732.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting and requiring certain actions relating to abortion involving the detection of a fetal heartbeat, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 732.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-11HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 732.
2023-07-11HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1061.
2023-07-11HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 14-6.
2023-07-11HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 07/11/2023 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
2023-07-11HouseSubcommittee reassigned: Lundgren, Andrews, Baeth, Best, Boden, Bradley, Brown-Powers, Forbes, Fry, Harris, Holt, Hora, Jeneary, Madison, Matson, Meyer, A., Moore, T., Turek, Wessel-Kroeschell, Wilz, H. and Wood. H.J. 1061.
2023-07-07HouseSubcommittee: Meyer, A., Andrews, Baeth, Bergan, Best, Boden, Bradley, Brown-Powers, Forbes, Fry, Jeneary, Kniff McCulla, Lohse, Lundgren, Madison, Matson, Moore, T., Turek, Wessel-Kroeschell, Wilz, H. and Wood. H.J. 1061.
2023-07-07HouseIntroduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 1061.
2023-07-07HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

SSB1223 (Related) 2023-07-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579.
SF579 (Replaced by) 2023-07-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1113.
HF732 (Replaced by) 2023-07-14 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1063.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback