IA HSB246 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF756
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act appropriating federal funds made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal funds are more or less than anticipated or if federal block grants are more or less than anticipated.
Title
A bill for an act appropriating federal funds made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal funds are more or less than anticipated or if federal block grants are more or less than anticipated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 666. |
2019-03-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Deyoe and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 417. |
2019-03-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
HF756 (Replaced by) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB246 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB246.html |