IA HSB230 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF479
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the denial of state funds to a local entity.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the denial of state funds to a local entity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 8:00AM RM 19. |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Salmon and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 488. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 487. |
2021-02-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1203 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 479.
SF479 (Replaced by) 2021-03-12 - Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719.
SF479 (Replaced by) 2021-03-12 - Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB230 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB230.html |