IA SF479 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the denial of state funds to a local entity.(Formerly SSB 1203.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the denial of state funds to a local entity.(Formerly SSB 1203.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3061 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3061 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719. |
2021-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 703. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 585. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 41, nays 7. S.J. 584. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3066, ruled not germane. S.J. 584. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3066 filed. S.J. 584. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3065, ruled not germane. S.J. 584. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3065 filed. S.J. 584. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3061 filed, lost. S.J. 583. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 475. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 467. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1203 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 479.
HSB230 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
HSB230 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1